Docket History
5/23/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING TRUSTEE'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE; ORDER STRIKING NOTICES FILED BY NON-PARTY ANNAMALAI
8/26/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MR. ANNAMALAI'S OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION
8/15/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION
8/15/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY ON AUGUST 19, 2014.
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY ON AUGUST 19, 2014.
7/8/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENTS DATED FEBRUARY 3, 2014 ON JULY 29, 2014.
9/18/2013
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
13-3168 WITH CASE NO. 13-4016
9/11/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON NON-PARTY ANNAMALAI ANNAMALAI'S MOTION TO INTERVENE
8/5/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW
GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW
7/29/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO THE MAGISTRATE'S DECISION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER CIV. R. 60(B)
7/8/2013
INJUNCTION