Case Information
9/5/2014
2013CV03593
Common Pleas
Firooz Payan
Ortal Real Estate Management Inc.
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON DAMAGES ON SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
Robert Hanseman
Docket History
4/21/2014
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS
4/21/2014
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS
11/15/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON DAMAGES ON JANUARY 10, 2014 AT 2:00 PM
10/25/2013
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS
10/9/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 22, 2013 AT 9:30 AM
6/17/2013
INJUNCTION