DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD PURSUANT TO APP. R. 9(E)
Gary Plunkett
Docket History
7/27/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD PURSUANT TO APP. R. 9(E)
5/28/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT AND OVERRULING ADMINISTRATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION
5/28/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT AND OVERRULING ADMINISTRATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION
5/28/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT AND OVERRULING ADMINISTRATOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH A VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH A VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR MOTION FOR MEDICAL EXAM TO BE CONDUCTED WITH A VIDEOGRAPHER PRESENT
7/19/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM FRIDAY JULY 26TH TO MONDAY JULY 29TH
6/13/2013
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 926499 Date: 06/13/2013
FILED BY PLAINTIFF FILED BY GARY PLUNKETT