ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 9-26-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
Gilbert Blomgren
Docket History
8/14/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
OF 8-21-14 FOR SUBMISSION OF THE RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT
8/14/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
OF 8-21-14 FOR SUBMISSION OF THE RECEIVER'S FINAL REPORT
7/25/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY GILBERT BLOMGREN
7/25/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
FILED BY GILBERT BLOMGREN
10/4/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY MATTHEW SORG
9/30/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY
APPROVING RECEIVER'S INITIAL REPORT OF RECEIVERSHIP FOR THE PERIOD OF MAY 15, 2013 THROUGH JULY 31, 2013 AND APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE AND PAYMENT OF FEES AND EXPENSES
8/14/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 10-18-13 @ 1:30 P.M.
6/4/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
SHOW CAUSE/DISOLVE RECEIVERSHIP