Case Information
3/8/2016
2013CV02539
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
Krista Frogge
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
AMENDED ORDER TO VACATE ORDER FOR SALE AND WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SALE
Angela Kirk
Docket History
3/8/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
AMENDED ORDER TO VACATE ORDER FOR SALE AND WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SALE
3/8/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
AMENDED ORDER TO VACATE ORDER FOR SALE AND WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SALE
3/8/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
AMENDED ORDER TO VACATE ORDER FOR SALE AND WITHDRAW PROPERTY FROM SALE
7/15/2015
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 28, 2015 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
2/6/2014
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
10/16/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
9/20/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 10-25-13 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
9/19/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
6/14/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
S51
4/24/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE