Case Information
8/27/2014
2013CV01996
Common Pleas
Madge Coomer, Paul Coomer
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
MODIFYING TRIAL ASSIGNMENT DATE
Walter Wolske, Walter Wolske
Docket History
8/30/2013
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
AS TO MARK WALSH, M.D., ONLY FILED BY DAVID SHROYER
8/1/2013
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
DEFENDANT PREMIER HEALTH PARTNERS ONLY FILED BY WALTER WOLSKE
6/17/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
TO EXTEND TIME
6/6/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER FOR JOINDER OF SUBROGATED PARTIES
4/1/2013
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE