Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2014
9/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 12, 2014
8/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 9-12-14 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
8/22/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 9-12-14 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
8/23/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
7/25/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
2/26/2013
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
1/16/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE