Docket History
5/23/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
4/22/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 5-27-16 FILED BY Angela Kirk
4/22/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 5-27-16 FILED BY Angela Kirk
4/22/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 5-27-16 FILED BY Angela Kirk
4/22/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 5-27-16 FILED BY Angela Kirk
1/28/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 19, 2014 AT 8:30 AM
1/28/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 19, 2014 AT 8:30 AM
11/22/2013
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART US BANK'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM
8/13/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM
5/22/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 15, 2013 AT 8:30 AM
3/4/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; 3/20/13 AT 8:50AM