Docket History
5/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
5/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
5/18/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
10/2/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
7/9/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 05, 2013 AT 9:30 A.M.
6/11/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JULY 09, 2013 AT 9:30 A.M.
4/23/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 30, 2013 AT 9:30 A.M.
2/26/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 02, 2013 AT 8:45 A.M.
2/8/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 26, 2013 AT 8:45 A.M.
12/14/2012
CIVIL ALL OTHER