Docket History
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
10/16/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
(SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS)
9/6/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
(SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS)
7/10/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 15, 2013 AT 1:30 P.M.
6/7/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JULY 10, 2013 AT 2:00 P.M.
3/9/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 25, 2013 AT 2:00 P.M.
2/7/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 8, 2013 AT 3:00 P.M.
2/7/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 8, 2013 AT 3:00 P.M.
12/10/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE