Docket History
8/25/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
9/30/2013
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 945163 Date: 10/01/2013
8/23/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SETTING DEADLINE TO TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE
8/6/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 8/20/2013 @ 10:30 A.M.
5/28/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 6/11/2013 @ 10:00 A.M.
1/31/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 3/7/2013 @ 9:00 A.M.
12/28/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 1/29/2013 @ 9:45 A.M.
11/30/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE