Docket History
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 7-11-14 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 7-11-14 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
1/16/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/16/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
9/12/2013
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
6/19/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
SUGGESTION OF STAY UNDER BANKRUPTCY CODE FILED BY Jillian Henzler
4/16/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW
2/22/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
NOTICE DISMISSAL
11/21/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE