ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
CONTINUING HEARING AND APPORVING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Ralph Skilken
Docket History
7/27/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO STRIKE
7/27/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION TO STRIKE
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
MOTION OF THE RECEIVER FOR AUTHORITY TO CLOSE AND DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS FILED MARCH 18 2014
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
MOTION OF THE RECEIVER FOR AUTHORITY TO CLOSE AND DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS FILED MARCH 18 2014
6/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON ANY OBJECTION TO THE RECEIVER'S INVENTORY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE FEBRUARY, MARCH AND APRIL RECEIVER'S REPORT
6/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON ANY OBJECTION TO THE RECEIVER'S INVENTORY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE FEBRUARY, MARCH AND APRIL RECEIVER'S REPORT
4/7/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON ANY OBJECTION TO THE RECEIVER'S INVENTORY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY RECEIVER'S REPORT
2/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
SETTING HEARING ON ANY OBJECTION TO THE RECEIVER'S INVENTORY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY RECEIVER'S REPORT
2/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
SETTING HEARING ON ANY OBJECTION TO THE RECEIVER'S INVENTORY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY RECEIVER'S REPORT
2/5/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO RECEIVER'S INVENTORY ON PERSONAL PROPERTY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER RECEIVER'S REPORTS
1/13/2014
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY
1/13/2014
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DISSOLUTION OF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
1/13/2014
DECISION
DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ACCESS TO PROPERTY
1/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO RECEIVER'S INVENTORY ON PERSONAL PROPERTY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER RECEIVER'S REPORTS
1/10/2014
ORDER SETTING HEARING
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO RECEIVER'S INVENTORY ON PERSONAL PROPERTY AND ANY OBJECTIONS TO THE NOVEMBER AND DECEMBER RECEIVER'S REPORTS
12/9/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
RESETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO THE INVENTORY OF RECEIVER, DISSOLUTION OF ENTITY AND ON ANY AND ALL PENDING MOTIONS
11/21/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO THE INVENTORY OF RECEIVER AND ON ANY AND ALL PENDING MOTIONS
10/18/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF ENTITY
10/3/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT AND OVERRULING MOTION TO RECONSIDER DECISION REGARDING MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS
10/3/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY
9/16/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF ENTITY
8/27/2013
DECISION
SUSTAINING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND ORDER APPOINTING MATTHEW SORG, ESQ. AS RECEIVER
8/27/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL
7/31/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER
1/18/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
12/27/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
ON TERRY L. SMITH AND JACKASS FLATS, L.L.C.