Docket History
6/2/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
6/2/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
2/10/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
8/22/2013
DECISION
, ORDER, AND ENTRY OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION
6/11/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Jeffrey Albert
6/11/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Jeffrey Albert
4/4/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
SUGGESTION OF STAY UNDER BANKRUPTCY CODE FILED BY Amy Carr
1/14/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
11/5/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE