Docket History
4/14/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1097645 Date: 04/14/2016
4/14/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1097645 Date: 04/14/2016
4/14/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1097645 Date: 04/14/2016
7/21/2015
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
2/5/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
1/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JENNIFER MADINE
1/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY JENNIFER MADINE
4/23/2013
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
4/16/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
NOTICE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
2/11/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
SHOW CAUSE
11/30/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS