Case Information
12/2/2019
2012CV07060
Common Pleas
Pnc Bank National Association
Springboro Medical Arts Inc.
ENTRY
OF RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT
Jeffrey Hendricks
Docket History
8/12/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
VACATING THE AUGUST 5, 2015 JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED IN CASE NO. 2012 EX 59946
9/12/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT
9/12/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT
2/25/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION
2/25/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION
2/13/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE DECISION
FILED UNDER SEAL
2/13/2014
DECISION
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT
2/13/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE DECISION
FILED UNDER SEAL
2/13/2014
DECISION
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT
10/29/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
SET FOR NOVEMBER 5, 2013 AT 2:00 P.M. IN CHAMBERS
7/23/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JULY 24, 2013 AT 1:30 P.M.