Case Information
12/3/2019
2012CV06901
Common Pleas
Gmac Mortgage Llc, Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc
Gene Bucnaventura McKinley
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
Yanfang Li
Docket History
8/16/2019
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN MOTION TO DISMISS - SUBMISSION DATE SEPTEMBER 03, 2019
4/3/2019
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY YANFANG LI
1/26/2019
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
7/29/2015
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 9-11-15 FILED BY Richard Rothfuss
6/19/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/22/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 13, 2014
5/22/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JUNE 13, 2014
11/21/2012
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC'S NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY KAREN CADIEUX
11/16/2012
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
PROPOSED ORDER REACTIVATING CASE
11/14/2012
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
CASE DISMISSED
10/30/2012
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
ON GENE BUCNAVENTURA MCKINLEY
9/25/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE