Case Information
8/22/2014
2012CV06383
Common Pleas
River Valley Credit Union Inc.
Jose A. Portorreal
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
Vincent Lewis
Docket History
8/22/2014
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
6/18/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY STEPHEN MILES
3/4/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY STEPHEN MILES
12/5/2012
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE
11/19/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON DECEMBER 13, 2012 @ 9:45 A.M.
10/23/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS ON NOVEMBER 1, 2012 @ 9:15 A.M.
9/24/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS: OCTOBER 18, 2012 AT 9:15 A.M.
9/5/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE