Docket History
5/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
5/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
5/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DEED AND DISTRIBUTION
2/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR 4/25/2014 FILED BY JEFFREY JINKENS
2/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR 4/25/2014 FILED BY JEFFREY JINKENS
10/17/2012
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND SUGGESTION OF STAY FILED BY JEFFREY JINKENS
8/7/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE