DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #37 FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT THAT SENATE BILLS 80, 120, 281 & HOUSE BILL 214 ARE UNCONSTITUTIONAL & APPLY STRICT SCRUTINY UNDER 1ST AMENDMENT TO U.S. CONSTITUTION, ETC.
Dwight Brannon, Dwight Brannon
Docket History
9/15/2014
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING IN PART MOTION NO. 10 ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS RONALD J. FADELL, M.D., ROBERT M. LEMMING, M.D. AND KETTERING NETWORK RADIOLOGISTS, INC.
9/15/2014
DECISION
GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 46
9/15/2014
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #37 FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT THAT SENATE BILLS 80, 120, 281 & HOUSE BILL 214 ARE UNCONSTITUTIONAL & APPLY STRICT SCRUTINY UNDER 1ST AMENDMENT TO U.S. CONSTITUTION, ETC.
9/15/2014
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING IN PART MOTION NO. 10 ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS RONALD J. FADELL, M.D., ROBERT M. LEMMING, M.D. AND KETTERING NETWORK RADIOLOGISTS, INC.
9/15/2014
DECISION
GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 46
9/2/2014
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
NO. 35 OF PLAINTIFFS' FOR DECLARATORY NOTICE OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ALL CONSTITUTIONAL MOTIOS #33 THROUGH #46 AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
7/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AND ENTRY SETTING IN-COURT STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER
7/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
AND ENTRY SETTING IN-COURT STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER
6/24/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS 38, 43, AND 44 UP TO AND INCLUDING 6-25-14.
6/24/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS 38, 43, AND 44 UP TO AND INCLUDING 6-25-14.
6/12/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
6/12/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
6/9/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #5 OF DEFENDANTS DR. FADELL, DR. LEMMING AND KETTERING NETWORK RADIOLOGISTS, INC, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
5/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #1 OF DEFENDANT, JONATHAN VELASCO, M.D., FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS #34-46
5/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #1 OF DEFENDANT, JONATHAN VELASCO, M.D., FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NOS. 34-46
5/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PETER PAVLINA, MD'S MOTION #3 - FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS #34-50 ET SEQ.
5/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #1 OF DEFENDANT, JONATHAN VELASCO, M.D., FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS #34-46
5/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #1 OF DEFENDANT, JONATHAN VELASCO, M.D., FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NOS. 34-46
5/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 30 FOR LEAVE TO IDENTIFY SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 23 FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED LIMIT OF 40 INTERROGATORIES PER PARTY
5/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 30 FOR LEAVE TO IDENTIFY SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 23 FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED LIMIT OF 40 INTERROGATORIES PER PARTY
5/16/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 30 FOR LEAVE TO IDENTIFY SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NO. 23 FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED LIMIT OF 40 INTERROGATORIES PER PARTY
5/8/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/7/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #9 ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, BRUCE H. RANK, D.O., FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO RANK MOTION #8 TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
5/7/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #9 ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, BRUCE H. RANK, D.O., FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO RANK MOTION #8 TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
5/7/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #30 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE MOTIONS AND MEMORANDA DIRECTED TO CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES
4/25/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GARNTING PLAINITFFS' MOTION #28 TO EXTEND TIME
4/25/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GARNTING PLAINITFFS' MOTION #28 TO EXTEND TIME
4/22/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DECISION, ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #27 FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME
4/22/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DECISION, ORDER AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #27 FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME
12/24/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #22 FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME
11/26/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING RANK MOTION #4 FOR EXTENSON OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #20
11/26/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #21 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT RANK
11/20/2013
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
PLAINTIFFS' EXPEDITED MOTION NO. 18 TO ENFORCE COURT'S DECISION OF JUNE 5, 2013 FOR ALL PURPOSES, ESPECIALLY THE USE OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT INFORMATION DURING DEPOSITION
11/20/2013
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
NO. 11 IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT USE OF SETTLEMENT INFORMATION AT DEPOSITIONS
11/14/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #19 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT RANK
10/16/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RE FILING MOTIONS UNDER SEAL
10/10/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION NUMBER 14 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION NUMBER 11
9/30/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #13 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE REPLY TO MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT BRUCE H. RANK, D.O., REGARDING SUMMARIES AND EXCERPTS FROM DEPOSITIONS
9/30/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #2 OF DEFENDANTS RONALD FADELL, M.D.; ROBERT LEMMING, M.D. AND KNRI
9/30/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #3 OF DEFENDANTS RONALD FADELL, M.D.; ROBERT LEMMING, M.D. AND KNRI
9/6/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #12 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE REPLY TO MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT BRUCE H. RANK, D.O., REGARDING SUMMARIES AND EXCERPTS FROM DEPOSITIONS
8/30/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PETER PAVLINA MOTION #1 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE
8/22/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #2 ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, BRUCE H. RANK, D.O., FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #11
8/20/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION #1 OF DEFENDANTS RONALD J. FADELL, M.D.; ROBERT M. LEMMING, M.D. AND KETTERING NETWORK RADIOLOGISTS, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #10 FILED 7-29-13
7/22/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #10 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
7/3/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #9 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
6/18/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION #8 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
12/10/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
10/24/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 11-28-12 @ 9:00 A.M.