ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
Kevin Williams
Docket History
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/25/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 05, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
7/27/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 09, 2015 AT 9:00 AM
7/27/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 09, 2015 AT 9:00 AM
5/29/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASHLEY POWELL
5/29/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASHLEY POWELL
5/29/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASHLEY POWELL
3/18/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT
3/18/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY
GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT
1/30/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 05, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
1/30/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 05, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
10/1/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON DECEMBER 02, 2013 AT 9:00 AM
8/8/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 01, 2013
6/24/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
5/10/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 08, 2013 AT 9:30 AM
4/19/2013
ORDER SETTING HEARING
ON 60 (B) MOTION ON MAY 10, 2013 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM NO.7
4/5/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/4/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 15, 2013 AND MOVANT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 22, 2013
10/17/2012
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DECEMBER 17, 2012, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 07, 2013 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JANUARY 14, 2013
9/7/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 17, 2012 AT 9:00 AM
8/8/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 06, 2012 AT 9:30 AM