DECISION
GRANTING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/19/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
4/19/2016
DECISION
GRANTING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/19/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
4/19/2016
DECISION
GRANTING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/15/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/15/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/15/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
4/15/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
7/27/2015
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
7/27/2015
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
7/16/2015
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND REQUESTING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JULY 30, 2015 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 06, 2
7/8/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY
JUDGMENT ENTRY ENLARGING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE
6/13/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/7/2013
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
OF DEFENDANTS REDDY AND BOLTON FILED BY SAM CARAS
12/17/2012
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY DAVID DEUTSCH
10/3/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON NOVEMBER 21, 2012 AT 9:45 AM
8/22/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 AT 10:30 A.M.