Docket History
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
APRIL 24, 2014 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
APRIL 24, 2014 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
4/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
APRIL 24, 2014 AT 10:00 AM BY TELEPHONE
8/13/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 9/13/2013 @ 9:30 A.M.
10/15/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 11/6/2012 @ 9:30 A.M.
8/6/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 8/30/2012 @ 9:00 A.M.
7/5/2012
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE