Case Information
2/5/2016
2012CV04728
Common Pleas
Anita Hauser
City Of Dayton Police Department
DECISION
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Jason Matthews
Docket History
2/5/2016
DECISION
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
1/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME
1/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME
9/5/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 9-26-14 @ 10:00 A.M.
5/31/2013
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL
2/7/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 2-22-13 @ 9:45 A.M.
2/7/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 2-22-13 @ 9:45 A.M.
9/7/2012
ORDER: STAY
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY
8/31/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
6/28/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ENTRY APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
6/27/2012
CIVIL ALL OTHER