Docket History
4/14/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41835314
4/14/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41835314
4/14/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41835314
3/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4/15/16 FILED BY Patricia Block
3/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4/15/16 FILED BY Patricia Block
3/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4/15/16 FILED BY Patricia Block
3/11/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 4/15/16 FILED BY Patricia Block
7/17/2015
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
FOR POST JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
8/5/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
8/5/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
7/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 22, 2014 FILED BY CHANNING ULBRICH
6/9/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
6/9/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/5/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 6-13-14 FILED BY CHANNING ULBRICH
5/5/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 6-13-14 FILED BY CHANNING ULBRICH
8/7/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
FILED ON 05/02/2013
4/23/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
4/5/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CHANNING ULBRICH
1/7/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
12/21/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SHERIFFS SALE FILED BY TINA EDMONDSON
7/5/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
Order Setting July 12, 2012 8:45 am Status Conference
5/17/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE