Case Information
7/27/2015
2012CV00738
Common Pleas
Foundation Capital Resources Inc
Living Water Full Gospel Baptist Church
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DIRECT THE RECORDING OF A SHERIFFS DEED, AND DIRECT THE ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF POSSESSION
Kevin Shook
Docket History
7/27/2015
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DIRECT THE RECORDING OF A SHERIFFS DEED, AND DIRECT THE ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF POSSESSION
5/9/2013
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 920621 Date: 05/10/2013
11/26/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 1/24/2013 @ 9:00 A.M.
5/1/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 5-31-12
1/27/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE