Docket History
4/29/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
IN REM
3/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DISPOSITIVE MOTION DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/7/16
3/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DISPOSITIVE MOTION DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/7/16
3/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DISPOSITIVE MOTION DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/7/16
5/4/2012
ORDER DISMISS BANKRUPTCY
5/3/2012
NOTICE BANKRUPTCY
4/23/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE 5-25-12
3/5/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE 4-20-12
2/14/2012
Order setting scheduling conference by telephone on March 2
12/20/2011
For foreclosure