Docket History
5/19/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
5/19/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
5/19/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
2/17/2012
ORDER SUMMARY JUDGMENT ENTRY
1/26/2012
Order: summary judgment entry
1/17/2012
Order setting submission date of Jan 20
12/20/2011
Order: order granting leave to file motion for summary judgment
11/10/2011
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ALLOW ANSWER TO BE SUBMITTED INSTANTER
11/7/2011
Notice: File default motion within 14 days as to Carletha Wooden
10/4/2011
CIVIL ALL OTHER