Case Information
9/2/2014
2011CV06466
Common Pleas
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Rhonda M Mize
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
ORDERING DEED AND DISTRIBUTING SALE PROCEEDS
S. Scott Martin
Docket History
5/9/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
4/19/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
12/29/2011
Judgment Entry and Decree in Foreclosure
12/1/2011
Order setting briefing schedule motion for summary judgment due by 1/25/12: repsonse due 14 days after motion filing: reply due 7 days after response
10/19/2011
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE IN CHAMBERS 11-17-11