Case Information
9/15/2014
2011CV03005
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
William M. Krest
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 9/29/14; REPLY DUE 10/6/14
Craig Thomas
Docket History
9/15/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 9/29/14; REPLY DUE 10/6/14
9/5/2014
ORDER: REACTIVATE/REINSTATE CASE
AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS
11/13/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ENTRY REACTIVATING AND ORDERING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS
5/10/2012
ORDER DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
3/8/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE 5-10-12
1/6/2012
Order setting status conference in chambers on 03/08/2012 at 8:45am
11/30/2011
Order setting status conference by telephone 1/6/12 @ 8:50AM
10/4/2011
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE IN CHAMBERS ON 11-29-11