Docket History
9/15/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
RELEASING FORFEITED SALE DEPOSIT FUNDS
6/24/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 7/18/14 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
6/24/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 7/18/14 FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
2/28/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
1/2/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
10/30/2013
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER UNDER OHIO CIVIL RULE 60(B)
9/23/2013
DECISION
FINDING THAT THIS COURT LACKS JURISDICTION TO CONSIDER THE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
4/30/2012
NOTICE BANKRUPTCY
4/26/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
12/5/2011
Judgment entry and foreclosure decree. Judgment entry and decree of foreclosure
11/7/2011
Order setting submission date for Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
9/29/2011
Notice: file summary judgment within 14 days