Case Information
7/15/2015
2011CV00929
Common Pleas
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association
Rodney K Litteral
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 7, 2015 FILED BY PETER MEHLER
Peter Mehler
Docket History
8/22/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
8/22/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY PETER MEHLER
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY PETER MEHLER
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY PETER MEHLER
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY PETER MEHLER
8/5/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ORDER TO WITHDRAW THE SHERIFF SALE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 30, 2013
8/23/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SALE FILED BY PETER MEHLER
8/23/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SALE FILED BY PETER MEHLER
5/24/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/4/2012
NOTICE SHERIFF SALE
2/2/2012
Judgment entry judgment entry decree of foreclosure
1/18/2012
Entry signed by judge & order vacating trial date 1/23/12
1/11/2012
Order GRANTING Plaintiff’s Motion for Leave to file Motion for Summary Judgment Instanter
10/4/2011
GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL