Docket History
3/28/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
VACATING IN COURT STATUS HEARING; SCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 6, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
3/28/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
VACATING IN COURT STATUS HEARING; SCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 6, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
3/28/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
VACATING IN COURT STATUS HEARING; SCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE FOR APRIL 6, 2016 AT 8:30 AM
8/6/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 6, 2015 AT 9:30 A.M.
2/5/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 03/06/14 AT 9;30 A.M.
3/1/2013
DECISION
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
4/3/2012
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION TO DISMISS
3/22/2012
ORDER: CONTINUE AGREED ENTRY
2/28/2012
Order
1/30/2012
Notice: intention to take possession deposition of Dorothy P. Masters filed by Joseph Rueth