Docket History
1/14/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 22, 2016
8/12/2015
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 08/14/2015
7/21/2015
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 14, 2015 FILED BY Richard LaCivita
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Richard LaCivita
5/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JUNE 20, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Richard LaCivita
2/6/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON FEBRUARY 28 2014 AT 10:00AM FILED BY Richard LaCivita
9/10/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
1/4/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ORDER TO WITHDRAW THE SHERIFF SALE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 4, 2013
7/27/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE FILED BY Richard LaCivita
4/11/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
3/23/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE