Docket History
7/27/2015
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
7/17/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
HELD ON 7/11/14
7/17/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
HELD ON 7/11/14
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
5/27/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR JULY 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM FILED BY Jillian Henzler
7/5/2013
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING MOTION FOR MEDIATION AND MOTION FOR STAY
4/16/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW
JOHN DOE