Case Information
8/17/2015
2009CV10082
Common Pleas
Us Bank National Association
Jerry D Walker
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 2, 2015 FILED BY ANDREW CLARK
Matthew Curry
Docket History
9/9/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS
9/9/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS
10/31/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY Kevin Williams
2/22/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SALE FILED BY CHARLES JANES
9/12/2012
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
SHERIFF SALE 9/21/12
8/28/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SALE FILED BY CHARLES JANES
4/26/2012
ORDER WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
3/9/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE