Case Information
8/26/2014
2008CV10896
Common Pleas
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Bryan S Moore
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
Lorelei Bolohan
Docket History
7/30/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 29, 2014 FILED BY Elizabeth Carullo
7/30/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 29, 2014 FILED BY Elizabeth Carullo
6/11/2014
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
6/11/2014
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
3/18/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING ORDER OF SALE
3/18/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING ORDER OF SALE
9/14/2012
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
NOTICE OF STAY OF FORECLOSURE AUCTION FILED BY GREGORY TURNER
8/2/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
NOTICE OF SHERIFF SALE FILED BY Elizabeth Carullo
4/6/2012
ORDER ENTRY REACTIVATING CASE FOR POST JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
12/9/2011
Order: stay order staying proceedings
12/2/2011
Notice: bankruptcy notice of automatic stay of execution notice of stay prior to real estate auction filed by Gregory Turner