Docket History
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
AND OF AUTOMATIC STAY FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
AND OF AUTOMATIC STAY FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
5/18/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
AND OF AUTOMATIC STAY FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
1/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 4, 2016 FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
1/25/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 4, 2016 FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
2/19/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 2/20/14 AT 12:00 P.M.
2/19/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 2/20/14 AT 12:00 P.M.
1/16/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE SET FOR 2/18/14 AT 10:00 A.M.
1/16/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE SET FOR 2/18/14 AT 10:00 A.M.
12/5/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON DECEMBER 18, 2013 AT 9:30 A.M.
10/24/2013
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SET FOR 12-13-13. FILED BY PATRICIA BLOCK
10/1/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE SCHEDULED FOR 10/8/13 AT 2:00 P.M.
8/20/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 23, 2013 AT 9:00 A.M.
1/3/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 3/15/13 AT 10:00 A.M.
12/18/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE RESCHEDULED TO 1/2/13 AT 10:30 A.M.
11/26/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/12 AT 10:30 A.M.
10/3/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 15, 2012 AT 10:30 A.M.
11/11/2011
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT MODIFICATION AGREEMENT ON 3/23/12 AT 1:30 P.M.
11/10/2011
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT MODIFICATION AGREEMENT ON 3/23/12 AT 1:30 P.M.
10/31/2011
Vacate hearing on motion & setting telephone scheduling conference on 11/10/11 @ 9:30AM