Docket History
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Channing Ulbrich
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Channing Ulbrich
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Channing Ulbrich
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Channing Ulbrich
3/24/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Channing Ulbrich
2/19/2013
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF SALE
2/19/2013
ORDER: STAY
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS (BANKRUPTCY CHAPTER 13)
2/6/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
2/6/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
2/6/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
2/6/2013
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
7/23/2012
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS
7/11/2012
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
6/28/2012
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
CASE NUMBER : 2001 CV 03495 FILED BY Maria Divita