24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2000239 | DESPAIN, PATRICIA | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
GT APARTMENTS LLC vs DESPAIN, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVG2000240 | JONES, DEJUAN | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
MOORE, KATELIN vs JONES, DEJUAN | |||||||||
CVF2000241 | CASSEL, PATRICIA | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs CASSEL, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVF2000242 | ROBINSON, LOIS J | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE INC vs ROBINSON, LOIS J | |||||||||
CVF2000243 | COOK, CHRISTOPHER | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs COOK, CHRISTOPHER | |||||||||
CVF2000244 | LEE, CHRISTOPHE | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs LEE, CHRISTOPHE | |||||||||
CVG2000238 | LANTER, CRYSTAL | 2/7/2020 | |||||||
GT APARTMENTS LLC vs LANTER, CRYSTAL | |||||||||
CVF2000235 | BARSALOU, DANIELLE | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs BARSALOU, DANIELLE | |||||||||
CVF2000234 | EVANS, JENNIFER | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs EVANS, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVF2000233 | HOLLINS, WILLIS B | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs HOLLINS, WILLIS B | |||||||||
CVF2000232 | BABB, KAREN | 2/6/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BABB, KAREN | |||||||||
CVF2000228 | SMITH, TINA C | 2/5/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs SMITH, TINA C | |||||||||
CVF2000229 | WASMUTH, NICOLE | 2/5/2020 | |||||||
IH CREDIT UNION vs WASMUTH, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVF2000230 | SUTHERLAND, ANDREA | 2/5/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs SUTHERLAND, ANDREA | |||||||||
CVF2000231 | THOMPSON, LUCAS L | 2/5/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC AS SVCR FOR WILMINGTON TRUST vs THOMPSON, LUCAS L | |||||||||
CVF2000225 | TURNER, APRIL C | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs TURNER, APRIL C | |||||||||
CVG2000226 | DOW I, TEASHA QUINNAE | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
ONLY CHOICE PROPERTY MGMT OHIO FOR CHARLES E HERRING & vs DOW I, TEASHA QUINNAE | |||||||||
CVG2000227 | CALDWELL, DAVID | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
ROOKWOOD PROPERTIES AGENT FOR vs CALDWELL, DAVID | |||||||||
CVF2000214 | COLLINS, DESTINIE | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs COLLINS, DESTINIE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 457, 458, 459 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |