24680 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2000213 | LAWLESS, ANGELA | 1/31/2020 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs LAWLESS, ANGELA | |||||||||
CVG2000212 | MESSENGER, LATONYA | 1/31/2020 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs MESSENGER, LATONYA | |||||||||
CVG2000197 | BRYANT, PHILIP | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
DBC REAL ESTATE MGMT LLC STONERIDGE APARTMENTS vs BRYANT, PHILIP | |||||||||
CVG2000198 | JONES, RONNIE | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
VSF INVESTMENTS 9 LTD vs JONES, RONNIE | |||||||||
CVF2000199 | HOGAN, SHILANDRIA | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO LPA vs HOGAN, SHILANDRIA | |||||||||
CVI2000200 | MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL NORTH | 1/30/2020 | |||||||
POLLOCK, DAVID vs MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL NORTH | |||||||||
CVF2000191 | GRINNELL, SHAROYA | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs GRINNELL, SHAROYA | |||||||||
CVF2000196 | GRAY, TERRI M | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs GRAY, TERRI M | |||||||||
CVG2000195 | OWENS, DERAY | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
ART PARADISE INC vs OWENS, DERAY | |||||||||
CVG2000194 | CORTISE, DONYAE | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
P.A.G. HOLDINGS LTD vs CORTISE, DONYAE | |||||||||
CVG2000193 | SANFORD, YVONNE | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
P.A.G. HOLDINGS LTD vs SANFORD, YVONNE | |||||||||
CVF2000192 | WILLIAMS, NONA | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs WILLIAMS, NONA | |||||||||
CVF2000190 | WEST, ANDRIANA | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs WEST, ANDRIANA | |||||||||
CVF2000189 | JOHNSON, TORI D | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND LP C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs JOHNSON, TORI D | |||||||||
CVF2000188 | COSEY, DONITA | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOC LLC vs COSEY, DONITA | |||||||||
CVF2000187 | WILLIAMS, CAROLYN | 1/29/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs WILLIAMS, CAROLYN | |||||||||
CVG2000185 | MANSON, CIARA | 1/28/2020 | |||||||
COLBERT, ANDREA vs MANSON, CIARA | |||||||||
CVG2000186 | DEBORD, KELLY | 1/28/2020 | |||||||
RIFE, RICHARD vs DEBORD, KELLY | |||||||||
CVH2000160 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 1/27/2020 | |||||||
BERRY, EMILY vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 451, 452, 453 ... 1232, 1233, 1234 Next |