24763 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2000807 | SHROPSHIRE, DAKESHA | 5/22/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS AND vs SHROPSHIRE, DAKESHA | |||||||||
CVG2000780 | GRINSTEAD, JANICE | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS AND vs GRINSTEAD, JANICE | |||||||||
CVI2000790 | JONES, SAMANTHA | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
RUDY, DALE vs JONES, SAMANTHA | |||||||||
CVH2000789 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
BROWN, TAIRA vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVF2000788 | BAKER, JEFFREY | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs BAKER, JEFFREY | |||||||||
CVF2000787 | PICKERING, BRADFORD | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS vs PICKERING, BRADFORD | |||||||||
CVF2000786 | SHEATS, MELODY L | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs SHEATS, MELODY L | |||||||||
CVG2000785 | SCOTT, MONA | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC vs SCOTT, MONA | |||||||||
CVG2000784 | MCCABE, JENNIFER | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC vs MCCABE, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVG2000783 | BRIM, ASHLEY | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC vs BRIM, ASHLEY | |||||||||
CVG2000782 | FREEMAN, JAVIER D | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC vs FREEMAN, JAVIER D | |||||||||
CVG2000781 | WILLIAMS, ROBIN | 5/21/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM LLC vs WILLIAMS, ROBIN | |||||||||
CVG2000776 | WATSON, AJANEE | 5/20/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs WATSON, AJANEE | |||||||||
CVG2000777 | DAVIS, WILLIE JR | 5/20/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs DAVIS, WILLIE JR | |||||||||
CVG2000778 | ORR, PAULA | 5/20/2020 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs ORR, PAULA | |||||||||
CVG2000779 | DAVIS, CINDY A. | 5/20/2020 | |||||||
TONI E. WEAVER - TRUSTEE vs DAVIS, CINDY A. | |||||||||
CVG2000774 | WRIGHT, ROBERT | 5/19/2020 | |||||||
SCHINDLER, THOMAS vs WRIGHT, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG2000775 | TRICE, DEREKA L | 5/19/2020 | |||||||
SCROGGINS, ANGEL N vs TRICE, DEREKA L | |||||||||
CVF2000765 | CARSON, SANDRICKA M | 5/18/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs CARSON, SANDRICKA M | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 431, 432, 433 ... 1237, 1238, 1239 Next |