24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2001712 | FRAZIER, JOSHUA | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
GT APARTMENTS LLC vs FRAZIER, JOSHUA | |||||||||
CVG2001713 | WRIGHT, NANCY | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
GT APARTMENTS LLC vs WRIGHT, NANCY | |||||||||
CVF2001714 | SHEPHERD, ADAM F | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs SHEPHERD, ADAM F | |||||||||
CVF2001715 | NEWELL, REGINA M | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs NEWELL, REGINA M | |||||||||
CVF2001716 | MERRITT, GENESSA L | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs MERRITT, GENESSA L | |||||||||
CVF2001717 | BRABANT, DAVID | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BRABANT, DAVID | |||||||||
CVG2001711 | PIERSALL, CHRISTINA | 11/20/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA RIVERS EDGE APARTMENTS AND vs PIERSALL, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVF2001704 | CASSIDY, SCOTT | 11/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs CASSIDY, SCOTT | |||||||||
CVF2001705 | EVANS, MICHELLE | 11/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs EVANS, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVF2001706 | SOVE, CHRISTOPH M | 11/19/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs SOVE, CHRISTOPH M | |||||||||
CVH2001703 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 11/18/2020 | |||||||
SCOTT, MICHAEL vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVF2001699 | SHELLABARGER, CHRISTINA | 11/17/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs SHELLABARGER, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVG2001700 | MCDONALD, TAMMI | 11/17/2020 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE PROP MANAGEMENT vs MCDONALD, TAMMI | |||||||||
CVG2001701 | BENOIT, SANDRA LEE | 11/17/2020 | |||||||
POWERS, JAMES W vs BENOIT, SANDRA LEE | |||||||||
CVF2001702 | WEBB II, DAVID R | 11/17/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs WEBB II, DAVID R | |||||||||
CVF2001668 | YATES-TRIBBLE, MYRA | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
CACH, LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs YATES-TRIBBLE, MYRA | |||||||||
CVF2001669 | FOSTER, GENELLE | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs FOSTER, GENELLE | |||||||||
CVF2001670 | RANKIN, WHITNEY | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs RANKIN, WHITNEY | |||||||||
CVF2001671 | BROOKS, JAMES | 11/16/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs BROOKS, JAMES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 397, 398, 399 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |