24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2100094 | LEWIS, DAWANA | 1/19/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LEWIS, DAWANA | |||||||||
CVF2100095 | KINNEY, JANINE | 1/19/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs KINNEY, JANINE | |||||||||
CVF2100093 | LING, TRACI | 1/19/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LING, TRACI | |||||||||
CVI2100048 | LOPEZ, FERNANDO | 1/15/2021 | |||||||
GEMUSIER, KARL E vs LOPEZ, FERNANDO | |||||||||
CVF2100049 | SCOTT, STACY J | 1/15/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs SCOTT, STACY J | |||||||||
CVH2100050 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 1/15/2021 | |||||||
JORDAN, ANDRE vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVF2100044 | DAVIS, DELOREAN | 1/14/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs DAVIS, DELOREAN | |||||||||
CVH2100045 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 1/14/2021 | |||||||
RICE, JASMINE S vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2100046 | LOWENSBY, DION | 1/14/2021 | |||||||
GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC PC vs LOWENSBY, DION | |||||||||
CVG2100047 | MITCHELL, EBONY | 1/14/2021 | |||||||
950 EAST LLC vs MITCHELL, EBONY | |||||||||
CVG2100036 | CONOVER, AMY | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
ENGLEWOOD VILLAS & RESID LLC vs CONOVER, AMY | |||||||||
CVG2100043 | MILLER, MARCUS | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
AFC FUND V LLC C/O NCDG REALTY & PROP MGMT vs MILLER, MARCUS | |||||||||
CVF2100042 | WEST, RYAN | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs WEST, RYAN | |||||||||
CVF2100041 | SCHOMMER, GINA | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs SCHOMMER, GINA | |||||||||
CVF2100040 | FOLLIS, ROBERT | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs FOLLIS, ROBERT | |||||||||
CVG2100039 | DEHME, ANDREW | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
KENNEDY, CRAIG vs DEHME, ANDREW | |||||||||
CVG2100038 | DOULKIDAH, FARAH | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
POINT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR DENNIS KENNARD vs DOULKIDAH, FARAH | |||||||||
CVG2100037 | LOBOB, ASHLEY | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA ASSOC LLC vs LOBOB, ASHLEY | |||||||||
CVH2100034 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
COPES, SHERITA vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 383, 384, 385 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |