24680 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2101402 | RIDENER, CHRISTY | 8/16/2021 | |||||||
DC GOUGH PROPERTIES, LLC vs RIDENER, CHRISTY | |||||||||
CVF2101401 | REDMOND, APRIL | 8/16/2021 | |||||||
GLOBAL LENDING SERVICES LLC vs REDMOND, APRIL | |||||||||
CVF2101370 | ERICKSON, BENJAMIN | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
MADISON HEALTH vs ERICKSON, BENJAMIN | |||||||||
CVF2101371 | ALBIN, SHELBIE L | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO vs ALBIN, SHELBIE L | |||||||||
CVF2101372 | BOURELLE, CATRESA | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs BOURELLE, CATRESA | |||||||||
CVF2101373 | C & W FACILITY SERVICES INC | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs C & W FACILITY SERVICES INC | |||||||||
CVF2101374 | STP PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs STP PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO | |||||||||
CVG2101375 | ATKINSON, ROBERT L | 8/13/2021 | |||||||
NEELEY, CALVIN R vs ATKINSON, ROBERT L | |||||||||
CVG2101368 | JOHNSON, MIKE | 8/12/2021 | |||||||
PRECIOUS LIFE CENTER vs JOHNSON, MIKE | |||||||||
CVG2101369 | MARQUIS, STEFANIE | 8/12/2021 | |||||||
PRECIOUS LIFE CENTER vs MARQUIS, STEFANIE | |||||||||
CVF2101367 | MILLER, RICKY | 8/12/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MILLER, RICKY | |||||||||
CVI2101366 | PROFITT, GEORGE ANTHONY JR | 8/12/2021 | |||||||
HAWORTH, SHAWN vs PROFITT, GEORGE ANTHONY JR | |||||||||
CVF2101362 | BAILEY, ANTHONY | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
AUTOVEST LLC vs BAILEY, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVG2101363 | BROWN, KYLE | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
VOCKE, NORMAN G vs BROWN, KYLE | |||||||||
CVF2101364 | SHADD, JAMES L | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
DENT-A-MED INC., vs SHADD, JAMES L | |||||||||
CVG2101365 | SEXTON, RICHARD ALLEN | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
MOINE GROUP INC vs SEXTON, RICHARD ALLEN | |||||||||
CVG2101361 | SMITH, JOSEPHINE | 8/10/2021 | |||||||
CLINARD, STANLEY B vs SMITH, JOSEPHINE | |||||||||
CVH2101352 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 8/9/2021 | |||||||
KUTI, MURAKINYA AKINTOYE O vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVF2101353 | BLANTON, GREGORY JR | 8/9/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs BLANTON, GREGORY JR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 309, 310, 311 ... 1232, 1233, 1234 Next |