24883 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2101740 | SIMES, KETEISHA T | 10/8/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs SIMES, KETEISHA T | |||||||||
CVF2101730 | SELLERS, AMY | 10/7/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs SELLERS, AMY | |||||||||
CVF2101731 | TURNER, GREGORY | 10/7/2021 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs TURNER, GREGORY | |||||||||
CVE2101726 | DEBARR, SARAH | 10/6/2021 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPCLTY INS CO vs DEBARR, SARAH | |||||||||
CVG2101727 | REDFORD, DONNIE | 10/6/2021 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs REDFORD, DONNIE | |||||||||
CVG2101728 | SIMPSON, GEORGE | 10/6/2021 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs SIMPSON, GEORGE | |||||||||
CVG2101729 | LEWIS, SHATOSHA | 10/6/2021 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs LEWIS, SHATOSHA | |||||||||
CVG2101724 | BRYANT, TASHONDA | 10/5/2021 | |||||||
ENGLEWOOD VILLAS & RESIDENCES vs BRYANT, TASHONDA | |||||||||
CVF2101725 | CAM REAL ESTATE LLC | 10/5/2021 | |||||||
FRAZIER, JOSHUA vs CAM REAL ESTATE LLC | |||||||||
CVF2101707 | HILL, TIERRA T | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs HILL, TIERRA T | |||||||||
CVF2101706 | LONG, MELISSA A | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs LONG, MELISSA A | |||||||||
CVF2101705 | FISTE, DAWN K | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs FISTE, DAWN K | |||||||||
CVF2101704 | GRAHAM, ALICIA L | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs GRAHAM, ALICIA L | |||||||||
CVF2101703 | BAILEY, JERICA D | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs BAILEY, JERICA D | |||||||||
CVF2101702 | FRANCIS, JEFFREY A | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs FRANCIS, JEFFREY A | |||||||||
CVF2101701 | CASE, JOSEPH L | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs CASE, JOSEPH L | |||||||||
CVF2101700 | BETHEA, CASSANDRA M | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs BETHEA, CASSANDRA M | |||||||||
CVF2101699 | CHAMPION, MONIQUE L | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs CHAMPION, MONIQUE L | |||||||||
CVF2101698 | CLARK, JESSE A | 10/4/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO OF OHIO INC vs CLARK, JESSE A | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 305, 306, 307 ... 1243, 1244, 1245 Next |