24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2200252 | CAMPBELL, PHILLIP | 2/11/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SER LP vs CAMPBELL, PHILLIP | |||||||||
CVF2200251 | BALDWIN, BEVERLY | 2/11/2022 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SER LP vs BALDWIN, BEVERLY | |||||||||
CVF2200242 | WILLIAMS, CHELSEA | 2/10/2022 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs WILLIAMS, CHELSEA | |||||||||
CVF2200243 | WILLIAMS, KATHRYN E | 2/10/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs WILLIAMS, KATHRYN E | |||||||||
CVF2200244 | FOLLEY, ROBERT M | 2/10/2022 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs FOLLEY, ROBERT M | |||||||||
CVE2200246 | HALL, ETHAN | 2/10/2022 | |||||||
ALLEN, MARK G vs HALL, ETHAN | |||||||||
CVG2200239 | PETERSON, NATHAN | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
NOTTINGHAM ESTATES MHP LLC vs PETERSON, NATHAN | |||||||||
CVG2200241 | LAWRENCE, ADRIANNA | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
OBERER MANAGEMENT SERVICES AGT FOR BIG GUY PROPERTIES LLC vs LAWRENCE, ADRIANNA | |||||||||
CVG2200240 | ALLGOOD, CANDICE | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
OBERER MANAGEMENT SERVICES AGT FOR BIG GUY PROPERTIES LLC vs ALLGOOD, CANDICE | |||||||||
CVG2200238 | RICHARDS, MARTIN | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
FOX, GENE vs RICHARDS, MARTIN | |||||||||
CVF2200237 | EVANS, AMANDA | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
ROCK CREEK CAPITAL LLC C/O SONNEK & GOLDBLATT LTD vs EVANS, AMANDA | |||||||||
CVF2200236 | ABDEL-LATIF, MOHAMMED | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
R&R RECOVERY ZONE INC DBA PUROCLEAN EMERGENCY SER vs ABDEL-LATIF, MOHAMMED | |||||||||
CVH2200235 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 2/9/2022 | |||||||
LANE, CHARLES vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVI2200229 | COTTON, BRANDIS | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
BROOKS, SALVADORE SR vs COTTON, BRANDIS | |||||||||
CVH2200234 | REGISTRAR-BMV | 2/8/2022 | |||||||
FRALEY, DARRICK R vs REGISTRAR-BMV | |||||||||
CVH2200206 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
SHINN, MICHELLE vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2200207 | YOUNG, DEMONE A | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs YOUNG, DEMONE A | |||||||||
CVF2200208 | EATON, LEA ANNE L | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC F/K/A FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO vs EATON, LEA ANNE L | |||||||||
CVF2200209 | TRIBBLE, CALVIN II | 2/7/2022 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC CO LPA vs TRIBBLE, CALVIN II | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 267, 268, 269 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |