24826 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG1402000 | WILLISON, ERIC M. | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
COUNTRY BROOKE APARTMENTS vs WILLISON, ERIC M. | |||||||||
CVE1401999 | GAY, DJUAN LEE | 12/18/2014 | |||||||
AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE CO vs GAY, DJUAN LEE | |||||||||
CVH1401992 | RANKIN, MIKE | 12/17/2014 | |||||||
HAZLEY, JODI vs RANKIN, MIKE | |||||||||
CVF1401987 | EDERI, ARIK | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MAGNUM AUTO SALES & AUTOMOTIVE REPAIR INC vs EDERI, ARIK | |||||||||
CVG1401988 | GREEN, LATONYA E. | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
WILDER, SHARON L. vs GREEN, LATONYA E. | |||||||||
CVG1401989 | JONES, BROOKE | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs JONES, BROOKE | |||||||||
CVG1401990 | STUBBLEFIELD, STACY | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs STUBBLEFIELD, STACY | |||||||||
CVG1401991 | GRADY, RODRIQUEZ | 12/16/2014 | |||||||
MEADOWS OF CATALPA vs GRADY, RODRIQUEZ | |||||||||
CVE1401982 | HOWE, TERRY A. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INS CO vs HOWE, TERRY A. | |||||||||
CVF1401986 | SYKES, REBEKAH R | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs SYKES, REBEKAH R | |||||||||
CVF1401985 | STONE, SIMONE D. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CBCS vs STONE, SIMONE D. | |||||||||
CVG1401984 | CHRISTIAN, D'ARCO | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs CHRISTIAN, D'ARCO | |||||||||
CVF1401983 | MANNING, PATRICE | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs MANNING, PATRICE | |||||||||
CVI1401981 | MASTERCRAFT FLOORING | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
HUNT, JUDY L vs MASTERCRAFT FLOORING | |||||||||
CVH1401980 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/15/2014 | |||||||
CRAWFORD, BRITNEY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1401978 | LITTLE, TARA | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
VAUGHAN GROUP LTD vs LITTLE, TARA | |||||||||
CVH1401979 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 12/12/2014 | |||||||
BOWLING, BRITTANY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVI1401972 | SPENCER, CHRISTINA | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
SIDDENS, LYDIA M vs SPENCER, CHRISTINA | |||||||||
CVG1401973 | GRAVES, IVAN | 12/11/2014 | |||||||
SIDDENS, LYDIA M vs GRAVES, IVAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1060, 1061, 1062 ... 1240, 1241, 1242 Next |