24883 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF1500523 | GOODER, ANDREW N | 4/17/2015 | |||||||
CONVERGENCE RECEIVABLES L.C. vs GOODER, ANDREW N | |||||||||
CVG1500524 | VARHELYI, ROSEMARY | 4/17/2015 | |||||||
CAR-TWO, INC. vs VARHELYI, ROSEMARY | |||||||||
CVF1500522 | SCHOEN, JAMES | 4/17/2015 | |||||||
AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, LLC vs SCHOEN, JAMES | |||||||||
CVH1500520 | PETIT, DON | 4/16/2015 | |||||||
CLARK, FRANK vs PETIT, DON | |||||||||
CVH1500521 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 4/16/2015 | |||||||
WILLOUGHBY, LISA vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVG1500518 | SCOTT, CARA J. | 4/15/2015 | |||||||
ROOKWOOD PROPERTIES vs SCOTT, CARA J. | |||||||||
CVG1500519 | CALAHAN, NICOLE | 4/15/2015 | |||||||
HAINES, LINDA vs CALAHAN, NICOLE | |||||||||
CVI1500516 | SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING | 4/14/2015 | |||||||
DUDLEY, ALFONSO vs SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING | |||||||||
CVF1500517 | DAVIDSON, JAMES | 4/14/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs DAVIDSON, JAMES | |||||||||
CVF1500512 | CLEMENTS, JOSEPH | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs CLEMENTS, JOSEPH | |||||||||
CVG1500511 | MITCHEM, D'JAVEN | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs MITCHEM, D'JAVEN | |||||||||
CVG1500510 | SEALEY, MONIQUE | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
MAK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs SEALEY, MONIQUE | |||||||||
CVF1500509 | O'BERRY, ANTOINE | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs O'BERRY, ANTOINE | |||||||||
CVF1500508 | LOWE, DOUGLAS W. | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LOWE, DOUGLAS W. | |||||||||
CVF1500507 | ROBERTSON, CLEO | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
NATIONWIDE AGRIBUSINESS INS CO vs ROBERTSON, CLEO | |||||||||
CVH1500506 | LAWLER, JASON A | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
FLATT, SHAWN vs LAWLER, JASON A | |||||||||
CVG1500505 | BROWN, GEORGE | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
COLLIER, EARL G. vs BROWN, GEORGE | |||||||||
CVG1500504 | FIELDS, TEERIKA | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON NORTHLAND VILLAGE LTD vs FIELDS, TEERIKA | |||||||||
CVG1500503 | HAYES, DARRIA | 4/13/2015 | |||||||
DAYTON NORTHLAND VILLAGE LTD vs HAYES, DARRIA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1028, 1029, 1030 ... 1243, 1244, 1245 Next |