Daily Law Journal
6194 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number Defendant Date
CVF1401964 WALLS, LAMOURA M. 12/8/2014
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs WALLS, LAMOURA M.
CVF1401965 STEWART, JASON 12/8/2014
CITY OF CLAYTON, OHIO vs STEWART, JASON
CVH1401963 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 12/8/2014
FAUSEY, JUSTIN vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1401952 WASHINGTON, DEBORAH L 12/5/2014
CBCS vs WASHINGTON, DEBORAH L
CVI1401955 CARDER, JEFFREY 12/5/2014
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs CARDER, JEFFREY
CVF1401953 MOORE, TIMOTHY 12/5/2014
LVNV FUNDING, LLC ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA vs MOORE, TIMOTHY
CVI1401956 BATTEIGER, CHRISTINA 12/5/2014
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs BATTEIGER, CHRISTINA
CVF1401951 WIELAND, DAVID A. 12/5/2014
CBCS vs WIELAND, DAVID A.
CVI1401954 WILLIAMS, THOMAS 12/5/2014
WOODS & WOODS ASSOCIATES (CONSTANCE R. WOODS) vs WILLIAMS, THOMAS
CVF1401950 JENKINS, KELLY N 12/4/2014
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JENKINS, KELLY N
CVG1401949 TRAPPS, TAMIKA 12/4/2014
NORTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs TRAPPS, TAMIKA
CVG1401945 HALL, THOMAS 12/3/2014
TOWNE PROPERTIES vs HALL, THOMAS
CVH1401948 RANKIN, MIKE 12/3/2014
MOFFITT, BRANDON vs RANKIN, MIKE
CVH1401919 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V. 12/3/2014
DOMINECK, TATIANNA vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, B.M.V.
CVF1401946 SAMPSON, MARY JO 12/3/2014
UNION TIRE & AUTO, INC. vs SAMPSON, MARY JO
CVG1401944 REESE, JACQUELINE 12/3/2014
TOWNE PROPERTIES vs REESE, JACQUELINE
CVF1401947 SCHOEN, JAMES 12/3/2014
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs SCHOEN, JAMES
CVI1401918 BROWN, CHAD 12/2/2014
CITY OF VANDALIA TAX OFFICE vs BROWN, CHAD
CVE1401916 VANEGAS, JOVEN ANDERO 12/2/2014
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO. INS CO vs VANEGAS, JOVEN ANDERO

Previous  1, 2, 3, ... 308, 309, 310  Next